+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held awaiting committee of whole
- Consent calendar: 1:17 pmobject
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass
On January 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Senate first read
+ − Vote
January 23, 2012: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor