+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
- Final reading in Senate: Passed
- Senate concurred.
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference committee recommended.
- Senate Minority Caucus.
- Transmit to Senate.
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor Amend to Bill - Campbell - passed
- Amended by TI - passed
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Committee of the Whole consent calendar at 1:44PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee: do pass amended.
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee.
- First read in House.
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- TRANSIT (ref Bill) adopted
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Technology Committee: do pass amended.
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Technology Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
April 19, 2018: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 29
April 11, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 2
February 19, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 19, 2018: House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 5, 2018: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 17, 2018: Senate Transportation and Technology Committee
- Yeas: 7