+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 6, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House County and Municipal Affairs Committee: do pass.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House County and Municipal Affairs Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:05PM.
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass.
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (10)
May 6, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 51
May 6, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 51
- Present/NV: 9
February 17, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 17, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 17, 2016: County and Municipal Affairs: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
February 17, 2016: House County and Municipal Affairs Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 8, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
February 8, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
January 20, 2016: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 20, 2016: Government: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7