+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 52
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 9, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 3, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Consent calendar: 10:30 am
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs: Do pass
On February 26, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: NRRA (ref Bill)
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass amended
On January 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On January 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (6)
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
Senate Adopted Amendment
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
Senate Proposed Amendment
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
Senate Proposed Amendment
2-9 caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
Senate Adopted Amendment
1-29nrra
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 9, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 4
February 22, 2007: Counties, Municipalities and Military Affairs: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
February 22, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
February 21, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 2
January 23, 2007: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7