+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On July 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 62 e
On July 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On June 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 26, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On June 25, 2009 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On June 23, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On June 22, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Education
- House first read
- Education: Do pass
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On June 19, 2009 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On June 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
- Amendment adopted: Huppenthal flr amend (ref ED)
- Amendment adopted: ED (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On June 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On June 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On June 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Education Accountability and Reform: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On June 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Education Accountability and Reform
- Senate second read
On January 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (11)
Education Accountability and Reform - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Huppenthal Floor Amendment; reference to ED amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Education Accountability and Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Education Accountability and Reform - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Education Accountability and Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Education Accountability and Reform - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Huppenthal Floor Amendment; reference to ED amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
1197ED_STRIKER MEMO_CAUCUS FLOOR
Senate Fact Sheet
Education Accountability and Reform - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
12-04 asvetoed
Senate Fact Sheet
6-8 ed strikermemo
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
June 26, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 10
June 22, 2009: Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
June 22, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
June 18, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 3
June 4, 2009: Education Accountability and Reform: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor