+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Vetoed
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Representative Robson moved that the House reconsider SB 1197 on Thurs, March 24th, 2016
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Failed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 3:37PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- House Education Committee: do pass.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Education Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Griffin flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:05PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Education Committee: do pass.
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendments (2)
Griffin flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
March 24, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 28
March 16, 2016: Third read: failed (House)
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 32
February 24, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 24, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 24, 2016: Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
February 24, 2016: House Education Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
February 11, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 4
February 11, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
January 20, 2016: Senate Education Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
January 20, 2016: Education: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor