+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
- First read in House.
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- COM (ref Bill) adopted
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Commerce Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Commerce Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 27, 2020: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 3
January 22, 2020: Senate Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor