+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 5:07PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- House Commerce Committee: do pass.
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Commerce Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:35PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee: do pass.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Votes (5)
March 23, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 14
March 2, 2017: House Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 9
March 2, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 13, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 3
January 24, 2017: Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor