+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 193
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On May 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On May 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 24, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 23, 2007 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: WM
On April 17, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 26, 2007 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass amended
- House second read
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 12, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: O' Halleran flr amend (ref Bill)
On February 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 12:40 pmobject
On January 31, 2007 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass
On January 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On January 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (8)
O'Halleran Floor Amendment, reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Ways and Means
House Adopted Amendment
O'Halleran Floor Amendment, reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
4-24 house changes memo
Senate Fact Sheet
Ways and Means
House Adopted Amendment
5-17 as enacted
Senate Fact Sheet
2-14 as passed senae
Senate Fact Sheet
1-29fin
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
May 2, 2007: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
April 24, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 53
- Present/NV: 7
February 22, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 3
February 22, 2007: Ways and Means: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 10
February 12, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
January 23, 2007: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 8