+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Military Affairs and Public Safety
- Rules
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: JUD (ref Bill)
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass amended
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
March 2, 2015: Military Affairs and Public Safety: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 23, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
January 26, 2015: Judiciary: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor