+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Government and Higher Education: Failed to pass
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government and Higher Education
- Rules
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: FIN (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref FIN)
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass amended
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Education: Do pass
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government and Higher Education - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Finance
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 12, 2015: Government and Higher Education: Failed to pass (House)
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 5
- Absent: 1
March 9, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 3
January 26, 2015: Education: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
January 26, 2015: Finance: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1