+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee recommended.
- Senate Minority Caucus.
- Transmit to Governor.
- Senate concurred.
- Final reading in Senate: Passed
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor Amend to Bill - Mesnard - passed
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 5:20PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- House Government Committee: do pass.
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Government Committee.
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Petersen flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:35PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
April 25, 2017: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 28
April 20, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 3
February 28, 2017: House Government Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 28, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
February 13, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 24, 2017: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor