+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
- Final disposition: Retained on the committee of the whole calendar
On March 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On February 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:48 pmobject
On February 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Do pass
On January 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
2-2 health
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Vote
January 25, 2010: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor