+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 23, 2022 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 29, 2022 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On March 28, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:15PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- House Judiciary Committee: do pass.
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 14, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Judiciary Committee.
- First read in House.
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senator Petersen motion to reconsider whereby the Senate failed to pass SB 1191 on Third Reading on February 23, 2022. Motion carried.
- Third read in Senate: FAILED
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- JUD (ref Bill) adopted
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Judiciary Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On January 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 14, 2022: House Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
March 14, 2022: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
March 9, 2022: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 12
January 18, 2022: Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor