+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 281
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate concurrence
- Senate final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 11, 2012 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 10, 2012 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 2, 2012 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: WM
On March 20, 2012 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 19, 2012 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass amended
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 16, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Griffin flr amend (ref Bill)
On February 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:30 pmobject
On February 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass
On January 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (8)
Ways and Means
House Adopted Amendment
Griffin flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Ways and Means
House Adopted Amendment
4-11 fin_housechanges
Senate Fact Sheet
Griffin flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
6-22 fin_asenacted
Senate Fact Sheet
2-20 fin_aspassed
Senate Fact Sheet
2-8 fin
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 12, 2012: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
April 10, 2012: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
February 27, 2012: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 27, 2012: Ways and Means: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 9
February 20, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 4
January 19, 2012: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor