+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 187
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 20, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 20, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 12, 2010 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On April 6, 2010 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 29, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 24, 2010 in the House:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass
On March 16, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On March 15, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment withdrawn: HEALTH (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Leff flr amend (ref Bill)
On February 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Do pass amended
On January 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (11)
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Leff Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Adopted Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Leff Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
2-4 health_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Adopted Amendment
2-1 health
Senate Fact Sheet
3-11 health_aspassed
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 20, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 3
March 15, 2010: Health and Human Services: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
March 15, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
March 1, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
January 25, 2010: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor