+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 14, 2012 in the House:
- Health and Human Services: Held
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- House second read
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Rules
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: HMLR (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Barto flr amend (ref HMLR)
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Do pass amended
On January 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (9)
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Barto flr amend (ref HMLR) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Health and Human Services
House Proposed Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Adopted Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Health and Human Services
House Proposed Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 28, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 8
January 19, 2012: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor