+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (43)
On May 10, 2010 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 302
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 29, 2010 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- CONFERENCE COMMITTEE:
On April 28, 2010 in the House:
- House appointed: Biggs, Sinema, Tobin
- Senate discharge:
- House discharge:
- Senate final read: Date ayes nays nv exc vac emer rfe 2/3 vote result
- Vote detail 22 8 0 0 passed
On April 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate appointed: Leff, Aguirre, Bunch
On April 19, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 19, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 14, 2010 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment withdrawn: HHS
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Sinema
On April 8, 2010 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On April 6, 2010 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 5, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 31, 2010 in the House:
- Judiciary: Withdrawn
On March 24, 2010 in the House:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass amended
On March 22, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On March 18, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 1, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 2:25 pm
On February 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Do pass
On February 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
- Commerce and Economic Development: Withdrawn
On January 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Economic Development
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (5)
Sinema Floor amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Health and Human Services
House Adopted Amendment
Sinema Floor amendment; reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Health and Human Services
House Adopted Amendment
6-1 health_asenacted
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 28, 2010: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 8
April 19, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 5
March 18, 2010: Health and Human Services: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
March 18, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
March 1, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
February 1, 2010: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2