+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On July 1, 2009 in the Senate:
- Action: Vetoed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On June 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Burns flr amend (ref APPROP) (sub Rules)
- Amendment adopted: APPROP (ref Bill)
- Amendment: RULES (ref APPROP)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Third read: Passed
On June 4, 2009 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Third read: Passed
On June 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On May 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On April 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Senate second read
On January 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (10)
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Burns Floor Amendment; reference to APPROP amendment; sub to Rules Amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Burns Floor Amendment; reference to APPROP amendment; sub to Rules Amendment
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
June 4, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 5
June 4, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 13
April 23, 2009: Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor