+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 153
- Action: Signed
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Senate final read: Passed
- Senate concurrence
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Thorpe #2
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Thorpe #1
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Government and Higher Education: Do pass
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government and Higher Education
- House first read
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:33 pm
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rural Affairs and Environment: Do pass
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Rural Affairs and Environment
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (2)
Floor Amend to Bill - Thorpe #2 - passed
House Adopted Amendment
Floor Amend to Bill - Thorpe #1 - passed
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 26, 2015: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
March 24, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
February 25, 2015: Government and Higher Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
February 25, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 16, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
January 26, 2015: Rural Affairs and Environment: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 3
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor