+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senator Kern motion to reconsider whereby the Senate failed to pass SB 1187 on Third Reading on March 15, 2023. Motion carried.
On March 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: FAILED
On March 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Kern flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On March 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On February 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee: do pass.
On February 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
March 15, 2023: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 16
January 31, 2023: Senate Appropriations1 Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
January 31, 2023: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 4
January 31, 2023: Senate Military Affairs, Public Safety and Border Security Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor