+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On April 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 2 e
- Action: Signed
On April 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Third read: Passed
On April 2, 2009 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Third read: Passed
On April 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Senate second read
On January 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (7)
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
April 2, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 52
- Present/NV: 8
April 2, 2009: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 4
March 17, 2009: Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor