+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Bill - Blanc - failed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 5:17PM.
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- House Education Committee: do pass.
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Education Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:26PM.
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Education Committee: do pass.
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (5)
April 8, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 7
February 26, 2019: House Education Committee
- Yeas: 12
February 26, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 14, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
January 28, 2019: Senate Education Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor