+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 112
- Action: Signed
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate final read: Passed
- Senate concurrence
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Amendment passed: GOV
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Government: Do pass amended
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government
- House first read
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:30 pm
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Government and Environment: Do pass
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government and Environment
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (6)
Government
House Proposed Amendment
Government
House Adopted Amendment
Government
House Adopted Amendment
Government
House Proposed Amendment
4-16 ge_aspassedhouse
Senate Fact Sheet
2-5ge
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 16, 2014: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
April 15, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 60
February 25, 2014: Government: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 25, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
February 20, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
January 27, 2014: Government and Environment: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor