+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee: do pass.
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee.
- First read in House.
On February 25, 2022 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- APPROP (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 1, 2022: House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 14
February 24, 2022: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 28
January 13, 2022: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor