+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 7, 2010 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 272
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On May 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 29, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 29, 2010 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
On April 28, 2010 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 19, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On April 7, 2010 in the House:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass
On March 9, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On March 8, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 22, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: HEALTH (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Aguirre flr amend (ref Bill)
On February 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Do pass amended
On January 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (9)
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Aguirre Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Adopted Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Proposed Amendment
Aguirre Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
Senate Adopted Amendment
2-4 health_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
2-2 health
Senate Fact Sheet
3-11 health_aspassed
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 29, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Present/NV: 5
March 8, 2010: Health and Human Services: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
March 8, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
February 22, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
January 25, 2010: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor