+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Failed in committee of whole
- Motion to amend Committee of the Whole action: Show the bill passed as amended with GE amend and Griffin flr amend
- Amendment failed: Worsley flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Griffin flr amend (ref GE)
- Amendment adopted: GE (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Failed to pass
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Government and Environment: Do pass amended
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government and Environment
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (5)
Government and Environment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government and Environment
Senate Proposed Amendment
Griffin flr amend (ref GE) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government and Environment
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government and Environment
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Vote
January 24, 2013: Government and Environment: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3