+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 23, 2007 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held in House
- Third read: Failed
On April 11, 2007 in the House:
- Amendment: Floor Amend to Bill - Schapira #2 - failed S/V 23-27
- Amendment: Floor Amend to Bill - Schapira #1 - failed S/V 23-26
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On April 3, 2007 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 21, 2007 in the House:
- Education (K-12): Do pass
On March 7, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On March 6, 2007 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Education (K-12)
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Johnson flr amend (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Education K-12: Do pass
On January 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Education K-12
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (4)
Johnson Floor Amendment, reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Johnson Floor Amendment, reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
2-12EDK-12
Senate Fact Sheet
3-1aspassedbysenate
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 23, 2007: Third read: failed (House)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 28
- Present/NV: 5
March 6, 2007: Education (K-12): Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 1
March 6, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
February 27, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 14
January 18, 2007: Education K-12: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor