+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 206
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 21, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 15, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On April 7, 2010 in the House:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass
On March 3, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:48 pm
On February 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Do pass
On January 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
2-1 health
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 21, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 16
March 2, 2010: Health and Human Services: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
March 2, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
February 15, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 3
January 25, 2010: Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor