+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: withdrawn.
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- House Education Committee: do pass.
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Education Committee.
- First read in House.
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:36PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Education Committee: do pass.
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Votes (3)
February 25, 2021: House Education Committee
- Yeas: 10
February 16, 2021: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 20, 2021: Senate Education Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor