+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On April 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 321
- Action: Signed
On April 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate final read: Passed
- Senate concurrence
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to AW - Jones
- Amendment passed: AW
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 4, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 24, 2011 in the House:
- Agriculture and Water: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On March 14, 2011 in the House:
- Commerce: Withdrawn
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Agriculture and Water
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- House first read
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Energy: Withdrawn
On January 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty: Do pass
On January 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Energy
- Assigned to committee: Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (10)
Agriculture and Water - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Agriculture and Water
House Proposed Amendment
Jones Floor Amendment; reference to the Agriculture and Water Committee Amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Agriculture and Water - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Agriculture and Water
House Proposed Amendment
Agriculture and Water - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Jones Floor Amendment; reference to the Agriculture and Water Committee Amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Agriculture and Water - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
4-18 gr_housechanges
Senate Fact Sheet
2-16 bsfss-ce
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 19, 2011: Senate final read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 12
April 14, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 4
February 28, 2011: Agriculture and Water: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
February 28, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 17, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
January 20, 2011: Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor