+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 19, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
- Third read in Senate: FAILED
On February 13, 2024 in the Senate:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 12, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:30PM.
On February 6, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On January 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass.
On January 24, 2024 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 23, 2024 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
+ − Votes (3)
February 19, 2024: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 17
January 23, 2024: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
January 23, 2024: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor