+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 16, 2010 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 79
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 8, 2010 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Third read: Passed
On April 6, 2010 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 29, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 17, 2010 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass
On March 3, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: CED (ref Bill)
- Amendment withdrawn: Harper (ref Bill)
On February 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass amended
On January 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Economic Development
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (6)
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce and Economic Development
Senate Proposed Amendment
1-29 ced
Senate Fact Sheet
2-4 ced_caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 8, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 5
March 2, 2010: Commerce: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
March 2, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
February 15, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 4
January 21, 2010: Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor