+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 7, 2010 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 271
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 29, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 28, 2010 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 21, 2010 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On April 13, 2010 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 12, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On April 7, 2010 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass
On March 31, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Government: Withdrawn
- Appropriations: Withdrawn
On March 16, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On March 15, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 3, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Landrum Taylor flr amend (ref Bill)
On February 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On February 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Government Institutions: Do pass
On February 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Government Institutions
- Appropriations: Withdrawn
On January 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
Landrum Taylor Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Landrum Taylor Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
2-9 gov
Senate Fact Sheet
3-23 aspassed
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 28, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 3
March 31, 2010: Commerce: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
March 15, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
March 3, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
February 1, 2010: Government Institutions: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor