+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 2, 2024 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 27, 2024 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 26, 2024 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 26, 2024 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On March 19, 2024 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 18, 2024 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:45PM.
On March 12, 2024 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 11, 2024 in the House:
- House Health & Human Services Committee: do pass.
On March 4, 2024 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Health & Human Services Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 29, 2024 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 29, 2024 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 13, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 12, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:30PM.
On February 6, 2024 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass.
On January 24, 2024 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 23, 2024 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (5)
March 26, 2024: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 15
March 4, 2024: House Health & Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
March 4, 2024: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6
February 29, 2024: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 4
January 23, 2024: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor