+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 152
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Government and Higher Education: Do pass
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government and Higher Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: RAE (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref RAE)
- Amendment adopted: Allen flr amend (ref RAE)
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rural Affairs and Environment: Do pass amended
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Rural Affairs and Environment
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
Rural Affairs and Environment
Senate Proposed Amendment
Rural Affairs and Environment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Allen flr amend (ref RAE) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 23, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 3
February 18, 2015: Government and Higher Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 18, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 16, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
January 26, 2015: Rural Affairs and Environment: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1