+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 161
- Action: Signed
On April 30, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 29, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 23, 2008 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On April 22, 2008 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On April 10, 2008 in the House:
- Water and Agriculture: Do pass
On March 31, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On March 27, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Water and Agriculture
- House first read
On March 18, 2008 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: Arzberger flr amend (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: NRRA (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 6, 2008 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 5, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Withdrawn
On February 13, 2008 in the Senate:
- Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass amended
On January 24, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
- Senate second read
On January 23, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (13)
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
Senate Proposed Amendment
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
Senate Proposed Amendment
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
Senate Adopted Amendment
Arzberger Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
Senate Proposed Amendment
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
Senate Proposed Amendment
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
Senate Proposed Amendment
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
Senate Adopted Amendment
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
Senate Proposed Amendment
3-5 caucus-floor
Senate Fact Sheet
Arzberger Floor Amendment; reference to printed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
Senate Proposed Amendment
Natural Resources and Rural Affairs
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 29, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
March 27, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 2
March 27, 2008: Water and Agriculture: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 3
March 18, 2008: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 1
January 24, 2008: Natural Resources and Rural Affairs: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor