+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Failed to pass
- Final disposition: Failed in committee of whole
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:33 pmobject
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety, Military and Technology
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Vote
January 26, 2015: Public Safety, Military and Technology: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1