+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee recommended.
- Senate Minority Caucus.
- Senate concurred.
- Final reading in Senate: PASSED
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- SIA - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: PASSED
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- House State & International Affairs Committee: do pass amended.
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House State & International Affairs Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: retained.
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Commerce Committee: do pass.
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Commerce Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 10, 2019: Senate Final Reading
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 10
April 8, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 21
March 5, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
March 5, 2019: House State & International Affairs Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
February 13, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 8
January 24, 2019: Senate Commerce Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor