+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- House Government and Higher Education Committee: failed to pass.
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Government and Higher Education Committee.
- First read in House.
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- McGuire flr amend (ref GOV) adopted
- GOV (ref Bill) adopted
- NR (ref Bill) withdrawn
- RULES (ref NR) withdrawn
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration amended with recommendation for a floor amendment.
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass amended.
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Natural Resources Committee: do pass amended.
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Natural Resources Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendments (11)
Natural Resources
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government and Higher Education
House Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Natural Resources
Senate Adopted Amendment
McGuire flr amend (ref GOV) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
March 8, 2016: House Government and Higher Education Committee
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 4
March 8, 2016: Government and Higher Education: Failed to pass (House)
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
February 29, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
February 29, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 20, 2016: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
January 20, 2016: Senate Natural Resources Committee
- Yeas: 6
January 20, 2016: Government: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
January 20, 2016: Natural Resources: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1