+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 5:07PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee: do pass.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:35PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass.
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Votes (5)
March 23, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 17
February 22, 2017: House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 22, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 14, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 23, 2017: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor