+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 16, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
- Final disposition: Held in House
On March 15, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Transportation and Infrastructure
- Rules
On March 3, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On March 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
- Amendment failed: Pearce flr amend (ref Bill)
On February 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On February 23, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:48 pmobject
On January 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass
On January 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 20, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Economic Development
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
1-22 CED
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (2)
March 3, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 1
January 20, 2010: Commerce and Economic Development: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 2