+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 15, 2012 in the House:
- Transportation: Failed to pass
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held in House
- House second read
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- Rules
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- House first read
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: GR (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref GR)
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Government Reform: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Government Reform
On January 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Senate first read
+ − Amendments (6)
Government Reform - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government Reform - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government Reform - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government Reform - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 2, 2012: Transportation: Failed to pass (House)
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 3
February 27, 2012: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 13
February 13, 2012: Government Reform: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor