+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 22, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 17, 2010 in the House:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass
On March 3, 2010 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held in House
- House second read
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- House first read
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On February 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 1:48 pm
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass
On January 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 20, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety and Human Services
- Senate first read
+ − Amendment
2-1 pshs
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (4)
March 2, 2010: Health and Human Services: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
March 2, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
February 15, 2010: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 30
January 20, 2010: Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor