+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 32
- Action: Signed
On April 4, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On April 3, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 11:30 am
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Transportation: Do pass
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On February 14, 2007 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On February 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On January 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On January 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 12:20 pm
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On January 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transportation: Do pass
On January 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On January 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Senate first read
+ − Amendment
1-19 trans
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 3, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 53
- Present/NV: 7
February 14, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 10
February 14, 2007: Transportation: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
February 1, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 3
January 17, 2007: Transportation: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor