+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Sitting Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor Amend to Bill - Olson - passed
On May 2, 2016 in the House:
- Cardenas to exclude Olson flr am to Approps failed by RCV
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor Amend to Approp - Olson - passed
- APPROP - passed as amended
On April 28, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- APPROP (ref Bill) adopted
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass amended.
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee: do pass.
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- First read in Senate.
+ − Amendments (11)
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
House Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Adopted Amendment
Floor Amend to Bill - Olson - passed
House Adopted Amendment
Floor Amend to Approp - Olson - passed
House Adopted Amendment
Appropriations - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
February 23, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 23, 2016: Appropriations: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
February 23, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 23, 2016: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 2
February 11, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
February 11, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
January 20, 2016: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 20, 2016: Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee
- Yeas: 9
January 20, 2016: Appropriations: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
January 20, 2016: Commerce and Workforce Development: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor