+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 20, 2020 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- APPROP (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass amended.
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Higher Education and Workforce Development Committee: do pass.
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Higher Education and Workforce Development Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 12, 2020: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 4
January 21, 2020: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
January 21, 2020: Senate Higher Education and Workforce Development Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor