+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- JUD (ref Bill) adopted
- Burges flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Judiciary Committee: do pass amended.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
February 14, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
January 24, 2017: Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 7