+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 3:37PM.
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- House Government and Higher Education Committee: do pass.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Government and Higher Education Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:40PM.
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass.
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (10)
March 24, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
March 24, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 59
February 23, 2016: Government and Higher Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 23, 2016: House Government and Higher Education Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 23, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 23, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 18, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
February 18, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
January 20, 2016: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 4
January 20, 2016: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor