+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee: do pass.
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Kavanagh flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:28PM.
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Government Committee: do pass.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Government Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 2, 2017: House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
February 28, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 14
January 24, 2017: Senate Government Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor